BRANKSOME CHINE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SAVE LIVES AND PREVENT DROWNING AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LIFESAVING, RESCUE AND RESUSCITATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN POOLE, BOURNEMOUTH & CHRISTCHURCH IN DORSET
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
453 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Poole
Governance
- 02 February 2021: CIO registration
- 29 September 2022: Funds received from 1042297 BRANKSOME CHINE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Dixon | Chair | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Kane | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allen PEMBROKE | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ZARA JAYNE POTTER | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James BEST | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt WRIGHT | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Nye | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £91.95k | £124.15k | £131.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £53.66k | £112.08k | £96.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED IS TO SAVE LIVES AND PREVENT DROWNING AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LIFESAVING, RESCUE AND RESUSCITATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN POOLE, BOURNEMOUTH & CHRISTCHURCH IN DORSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 RICHMOND ROAD
PARKSTONE
POOLE
DORSET
BH14 0BU
- Phone:
- 07545697597
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window