Financial history LUCY PRICE SUNDAY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 517064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £309.16k £1.20k £147 £3.72k £9.19k
Total expenditure £2.51k £3.98k £1.49k £256 £255
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A