THE ANTI-RACIST SOCIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Anti-Racist Social Club ('The Club') is a registered charity startup that works to create spaces and resources for education and open dialogue about becoming anti-racist allies and creating psychological safety in business and education. We also provide free advice and education via our website which houses over 500 resources for anti-racist and intersectional learning (original and curated).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 02 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Stewart De Jong | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Michael Deal | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatobi Arawole | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.07k | £102.10k | £23.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75k | £45.47k | £15.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ANTI-RACISM IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE USE OF (I) TRAININGS, (II) WORKSHOPS, (III) ONLINE COURSES, (IV) ORIGINAL CONTENT, (V) CURATED CONTENT, (VI) EVENTS, AND (VII) THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS, AND UNDERSTANDING OF HOW TO BE ANTI-RACIST, HOW TO BE AN ALLY TO COMMUNITIES THAT HAVE BEEN MARGINALISED OR EXCLUDED, HOW TO PROMOTE RACIAL TOLERANCE, AND HOW TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, ETHNICITY, AND OTHER PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS; I. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, “ANTI-RACISM” IS DEFINED AS (I) ANY FORM OF ACTION AGAINST RACISM, SYSTEMIC RACISM, AND THE OPPRESSION OF GROUPS THAT HAVE BEEN MARGINALISED OR EXCLUDED, OR (II) ANY CONSCIOUS EFFORTS AND ACTIONS TO PROVIDE EQUITABLE OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL PEOPLE ON AN INDIVIDUAL AND SYSTEMIC LEVEL, OR (III) THE POLICY OR PRACTICE OF OPPOSING RACISM AND PROMOTING RACIAL AND ETHNIC TOLERANCE, OR (IV) THE ACTIVE PROCESS OF IDENTIFYING AND ELIMINATING RACISM BY CHANGING SYSTEMS, ORGANISATIONAL STRUCTURES, POLICIES AND PRACTICES, AND ATTITUDES, SO THAT POWER IS REDISTRIBUTED AND SHARED EQUITABLY; II. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, “PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS” INCLUDE, BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO, AGE, GENDER, SEXUALITY, MARITAL STATUS, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY STATUS, RACE, ETHNICITY, NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS OR SPIRITUAL BELIEFS, AND LEVEL OF SOCIOECONOMIC STATUS 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION, DIVERSITY, EQUITY AND ACCESS TO OPPORTUNITY (“IDEA”) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH (I) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, ETHNICITY, NATIONALITY, GENDER, SEXUALITY, MARITAL STATUS, RELIGION/FAITH/SPIRITUALITY, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE/ SOCIOECONOMIC STATUS/LEVEL OF INCOME, DISABILITY STATUS, (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN IDEA, (III) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, AND (IV) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF IDEA; AND 3. TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY (I) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL AND ETHNIC GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL AND ETHNIC GROUPS, (II) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE AND ETHNICITY, AND (III) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND ETHNIC GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 80698
PO Box 6945
London
W1A 6US
- Phone:
- 07415526212
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window