HOMESERVE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieve unemployment by the promotion and support of apprenticeships to employers and potential apprentices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £680.00k | £168.55k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £527.19k | £321.37k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £680.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £527.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
3.1.1 RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF APPRENTICESHIPS TO EMPLOYERS AND POTENTIAL APPRENTICES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUPPORT APPRENTICES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT, AND 3.1.2 FURTHER ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window