THE ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST MARTIN AND ST HELEN, COLCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a parish within the Orthodox Church. We are committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at our church and chapel and to become part of our parish community. To that end we typically hold services on 3 days a week at St Martin's Church and St Helen's Chapel in Colchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALEXANDER ALISTAIR MATTHEW HAIG BD AKC | Chair | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Tasos Papastylianou | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elena Kanaar | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kampouridis | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon Peter Kanaar | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Theodora Ford | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Philip Harrison | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Shillaker | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Mary Haig ARCM | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catalin Fliscu | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dusan Radunovic | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Edwin Taylor | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.16k | £53.31k | £99.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £25.97k | £18.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
A TO PROMOTE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE RITES AND TRADITIONS OF THE ONE HOLY CATHOLIC ORTHODOX AND APOSTOLIC CHURCH AS EXPRESSED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, THE HOLY TRADITION, THE TEACHINGS OF THE SEVEN ECUMENICAL COUNCILS AND THE HOLY FATHERS AND AS PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE GREEK ORTHODOX PATRIARCHATE OF ANTIOCH. B TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN THE COUNTIES OF ESSEX, SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 MAIDENBURGH STREET
COLCHESTER
CO1 1UB
- Phone:
- 01206530530
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window