KINGSWAY RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our organisation provides groups, activities and clubs to the local community. These activities improve their health and well being, prevent social isolation and reduce anti social behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income includes £2,667 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 16 November 2020: CIO registration
- 10 September 2021: Funds received from 1145886 KINGSWAY RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
- 01 August 2024: Funds transferred to
- 01 August 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.28k | £31.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.19k | £59.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.76k | £2.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WEST TEIGNMOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, ETHNICITY OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window