RANGERS LODGE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A hospital for the care of sick, injured and orphaned wildlife with the view to eventual release back to the wild.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 January 2021: CIO registration
- RANGERS LODGE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL (Working name)
- RLWH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Burrows | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hoban | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bowden | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Edward Burrows | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Lucille Hatswell | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Hatswell | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Anthony Russell | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.93k | £22.20k | £24.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.88k | £12.68k | £29.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND BIRDS OF ANY SPECIES FOUND IN BRITAIN, BUT PRIMARILY NATIVE BRITISH WILDLIFE, WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN A TEMPORARY REFUGE OR HOSPITAL OR OTHER FACILITY FOR THE COLLECTION, RECEPTION CARE AND REHABILITATION OF SICK, INJURED OR ILLTREATED ANIMALS OR BIRDS UNTIL THEIR EVENTUAL RELEASE BACK INTO THE WILD OR OTHERWISE THEIR TRANSFER TO AN ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
RANGERS LODGE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL
FOREST ROAD
COLGATE
HORSHAM
RH12 4TB
- Phone:
- 01403379446
- Website:
-
RANGERSLODGEWILDLIFEHOSPITAL.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window