THE TREVOR TOWERS WELFARE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, including the support of cancer research, hospices and end of life care, search and rescue organisations and the provision and training of assistance dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Towers | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Ann Hatlee | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
KILLIK & CO TRUSTEES LIMITED | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Emily Louise Taylor | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/10/2021 | 20/10/2022 | 20/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30 | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £104 | £10 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 October 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES, INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, THE SUPPORT OF CANCER RESEARCH, HOSPICES AND END OF LIFE CARE, SEARCH AND RESCUE ORGANISATIONS, AND THE PROVISION AND TRAINING OF ASSISTANCE DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Killik & Co Llp
Crown House
Crown Street
IPSWICH
IP1 3HS
- Phone:
- 02073370500
- Email:
- trusts@killik.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window