ST. MARGARET'S CHURCH & COMMUNITY HALL, WREXHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides and maintains a community hall for the use of the inhabitants of Wrexham, including use for meetings, lectures, classes, recreation and leisure-time occupation. Provides support for St. Margaret's Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £31,700 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wrexham
Governance
- 15 January 2021: CIO registration
- 18 November 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
- 18 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1199546 WREXHAM MISSION AREA
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WREXHAM, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WREXHAM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, WREXHAM AND BY ALLOWING FREE ACCESS TO THE COMMUNITY HALL BY MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATIONS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, WREXHAM AND OTHER LOCAL CHURCHES AND CHAPELS AS A VENUE FOR SUNDAY SCHOOL, ACTS OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, PRAYER MEETINGS AND CHURCH RELATED SOCIAL EVENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window