SCHERZO ENSEMBLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scherzo is a professional development platform for emerging artists, particularly classical singers. Scherzo offers a programme of performance and training projects to a cohort of performers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 February 2021: CIO registration
- 06 November 2023: Funds received from 1182765 LUNCHBREAK OPERA
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cecilia Nutting | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fergus Slinger | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JAMES THOMAS | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Timothy Russell Hellyer Jones MA ARCM | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|||||
HAMISH TIMOTHY WARREN JANSON | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.11k | £107.19k | £116.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.97k | £104.30k | £116.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MUSICAL ARTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER OPPORTUNITIES AND ACTIVITIES WHICH THE TRUSTEES DEEM SUITABLE FOR THE TECHNICAL AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE SKILLS OF EMERGING MUSICAL ARTISTS IN DELIVERING EXPERT PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 Shakespeare Road
Herne Hill
London
UK
SE24 0PY
- Phone:
- 07495074286
- Email:
- scherzoensemble@outlook.com
- Website:
-
scherzoensemble.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window