PRO-VISION INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In pursuance of Christian principles, the Object of the CIO is principally for the public benefit to advance in life and to relieve the needs of orphaned and vulnerable children in Southern Africa by the provision of grants to charities or organizations working with orphaned or vulnerable children and their families or carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Angola
- Botswana
- Eswatini
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 January 2021: CIO registration
- PRO-VISION INTERNATIONAL UK (Working name)
- UNSUNG HEROES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Ingle | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Crawshaw Daniell | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerrit Johannes van Maarleveld | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kalypso Moraiti | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £509 | £150 | £883 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £400 | £380 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jan 2021 as amended on 21 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, WHICH ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT WITHIN CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SOUTHERN AFRICA AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED TO BUILD CAPACITY AMONG MINISTRY LEADERS, CHURCHES OR MISSIONS DESIGNED TO EQUIP AND ENABLE THEM TO DELIVER CHARITABLE PROJECTS AND CARRY OUT EVANGELISM AND MISSIONARY WORK IN DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ORPHANED AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH ORPHANED OR VULNERABLE CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS. 3. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH SUCH GROUPS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Glebe
Pembury
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN2 4EN
- Phone:
- 07984018400
- Email:
- jingle@unsung-heroes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window