CARE VENEZUELA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help different kind of NGO's: care homes, hospitals, medical dispensaries, indigenous communities, among others. Most of them are located in remote and very poor areas of Venezuela. Due to the humanitarian crisis, they lack from the most basic supplies as food, medicines, clothes, clean water, electricity, toys for children, etc and we help to alleviate those necessities as far as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Venezuela
Governance
- 28 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Isabel Araujo Briceno | Chair | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karmele Sagarzazu Achurra | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Carolina Guevara Garcia | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karla Sofia Hernandez Garcia | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Helena Diez Vera | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £12.03k | £9.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81k | £9.53k | £7.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN VENEZUELA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HEALTH AND MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND EQUIPMENT, FOOD AND ITEMS OF PERSONAL HYGIENE AND CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hornbeam Avenue
BUCKLEY
Clwyd
CH7 3AX
- Phone:
- 07437204837
- Email:
- info@carevenezuela.com
- Website:
-
carevenezuela.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window