POTENTIAL YOUTH MENTORING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of Potential Youth Mentoring is to work with Schools, Communities, Children and Young People predominantly aged 10-23 who are experiencing social, behavioural and emotional challenges and to help them and their families overcome these and improve their life chances. It does this through allocating a skilled and experienced Mentor to work with the young person and their family
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,283 from 14283 government contract(s) and £14,283 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Thomas | Chair | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Humphrey POUFONG | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcella Eileen Phelan | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Apay Obang-Oyway | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.10k | £54.79k | £72.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103 | £69.45k | £65.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £14.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £14.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, BEING UNDERTAKEN IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: Ò TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 5 - 23 THROUGH Ò PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND MENTORING/COUNSELLING WITH THE AIM OF SUPPORTING THEIR INTEGRATION INTO THE COMMUNITY Ò PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O PUG YARD
269 BALLARDS LANE
NORTH FINCHLEY
LONDON
N12 8NR
- Phone:
- 01923211218
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window