THE SUSANNE BEER CELLO CORNER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable purpose of the Foundation is: For the public benefit, the advancement of the art of music and the study of the cello for young musicians under the age of 26 years including but not limited to: 1. The loan of cellos to individuals in the UK. 2. Awarding such persons grants to further their musical education. 3. Provision of workshops, masterclasses and public performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 July 2021: CIO registration
- THE CELLO CORNER FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Simon David Cowell | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glen Fabian Thomas | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Tuach | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.76k | £4.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.21k | £4.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND THE STUDY OF THE CELLO FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS UNDER THE AGE OF 26 YEARS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1. THE LOAN OF CELLOS TO INDIVIDUALS 2. AWARDING SUCH PERSONS GRANTS TO FURTHER THEIR MUSICAL EDUCATION 3. THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, MASTERCLASSES AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
179 OFFORD ROAD
LONDON
N1 1LR
- Phone:
- 07973509333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window