TURPIN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Turpin's Charity provides grants to individuals and orgnisations who are in a condition of hardship, or distress (whether physical, financial or mental) who reside in the parish of Aston Clinton or the parish of Cholesbury-cum-St Leonards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 17 November 2020: CIO registration
- 03 December 2021: Funds received from 203751 TURPIN'S CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Maskell | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Neighbour | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Brigden | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WATSON | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Ann Bottomer | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.15k | £47.92k | £48.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.11k | £47.63k | £33.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF; 1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WHETHER PHYSICAL FINANCIAL OR MENTAL. 2. TO ASSIST WITH THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS. 3. TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION. 4. TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION OF ANY OTHER BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Brook Street
Aston Clinton
AYLESBURY
HP22 5ES
- Phone:
- 01296630857
- Email:
- info@turpinscharity.org.uk
- Website:
-
turpinscharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window