BRITISH SOCIETY OF NEURORADIOLOGISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Among others: To promote high standards in the clinical practice of diagnostic/interventional neuroradiology throughout the UK. To promote the place of neuroradiology as a core discipline of the clinical neurosciences. To advise/collaborate with regulatory and professional bodies regarding development of guidelines and standards for the practice of diagnostic/interventional neuroradiology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 February 2021: CIO registration
- BSNR (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Owen Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lalani Carlton-Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tilak Das | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr DIPAYAN MITRA | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Ian Jonathan Craven | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.35k | £29.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.62k | £44.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE CIO SHALL HAVE POWER TO DO ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING THINGS: 1 TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE CLINICAL PRACTICE OF DIAGNOSTIC AND INTERVENTIONAL NEURORADIOLOGY THROUGHOUT THE UK; 2 TO PROMOTE THE PLACE OF NEURORADIOLOGY AS A CORE DISCIPLINE OF THE CLINICAL NEUROSCIENCES; 3 TO ADVISE AND COLLABORATE WITH REGULATORY AND PROFESSIONAL BODIES REGARDING DEVELOPMENT OF GUIDELINES AND STANDARDS FOR THE PRACTICE OF DIAGNOSTIC AND INTERVENTIONAL NEURORADIOLOGY (WHICH INCLUDES STANDARDS FOR FACILITIES, DELIVERY OF SERVICE AND PROFESSIONAL ABILITIES); 4 TO SUPPORT THE CLINICAL PRACTICE AND CONTINUING PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF UK NEURORADIOLOGISTS; 5 TO ENSURE, IN COLLABORATION WITH THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF RADIOLOGISTS, THE GENERAL MEDICAL COUNCIL AND ANY OTHER RELEVANT BODY, THAT TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF NEURORADIOLOGISTS ARE APPROPRIATE AND OF A HIGH STANDARD; 6 TO MONITOR AND ADVISE ON THE NUMBER OF UK NEURORADIOLOGY TRAINEES AND TRAINING POSTS IN ORDER TO ASSIST IN BALANCING SUPPLY OF AND DEMAND FOR NEURORADIOLOGISTS; 7 TO STIMULATE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH AND RESEARCH NETWORKS INCLUDING ETHICAL COLLABORATION WITH RADIOLOGICAL AND THERAPEUTIC EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURERS AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE SCIENTIFIC EVALUATION OF EQUIPMENT AND DEVICES BY HIGH QUALITY TRIALS; 8 TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN RELATIONSHIPS WITH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL PROFESSIONAL BODIES RELEVANT TO NEURORADIOLOGY; 9 TO FOSTER COMMUNICATION WITH PATIENT GROUPS; AND 10 TO PROMOTE NEURORADIOLOGY TO MEDICAL STUDENTS, JUNIOR DOCTORS AND TRAINEE RADIOLOGISTS AS A REWARDING AND ENJOYABLE CAREER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Royal College Of Radiologists
63 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3JW
- Phone:
- 07547720329
- Email:
- postmaster@bsnr.org.uk
- Website:
-
bsnr.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window