BLACKBIRD LEYS AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing access to regular physical exercise and training in a disciplined, safe and welcoming environment for anyone, irrespective of gender, age and ability in the sport of amateur boxing for Blackbird Leys and the surrounding communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,588 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Hart | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Buck | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Perisi | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Walsh | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.52k | £31.99k | £33.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.21k | £16.57k | £16.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £8.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN OXFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN AMATEUR BOXING. 3.2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: 3.2.1 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.2.2 PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 MALLARD CLOSE
OXFORD
OX4 6EN
- Phone:
- 01865377244
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window