NOSTOS HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief of those in need by reason of social and economic disadvantage who are (i) forcibly displaced and have lost their homes as a result of violent conflict or catastrophe or (ii) living in areas lacking necessary infrastructure, in particular by the supply of emergency shelters, longer-term housing, medical centres, schools, and community spaces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 22 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madhav Datt | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kaushal Shetty | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pok Yan Felix Chu | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.29k | £20.31k | £19.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56k | £27.79k | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jan 2021 as amended on 14 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
For the public benefit, the relief of those in need by reason of ill health, financial hardship or other social and economic disadvantage who are: (i) forcibly displaced and have lost their homes as a result of violent conflict, natural disaster, trouble, or catastrophe, in particular by the supply of emergency shelter and longer-term housing to such people; or (ii) living in areas lacking necessary social and medical infrastructure, in particular by the supply of shelter units for use as medical centres, schools, and shared community spaces.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35
37 CAMDEN ROAD
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07307070373
- Email:
- info@nostoshomes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window