MANDALA THEATRE COMPANY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mandala Theatre Company CIO delivers training to young people and pathways for young artists for the advancement of education in the arts in Oxford, and the surrounding area, in particular but not exclusively through the creation and performance of theatre productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £105,166 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sasha East | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shabnum Chaudry | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhaea Russell-Cartwright | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabah Heydon | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adanna Onuekwusi | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Harry | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.09k | £206.01k | £134.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.69k | £181.14k | £98.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £69.54k | £937 | £105.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN OXFORD, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE CREATION AND PERFORMANCE OF THEATRE PRODUCTIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 CRESCENT ROAD
OXFORD
OX4 2PD
- Phone:
- 01865711341
- Email:
- info@mandalatheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.