EMILIANI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emiliani Trust has been supporting underprivileged children and orphans in Zimbabwe in their education programs by paying their school fees and providing them with school wear, books, and the necessary equipment to enable them to attain education. Emiliani Trust works with unpaid volunteers such as school heads, religious organizations, and community leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 05 January 2021: CIO registration
- EMILIANI (Previous name)
- GEMINI TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tsitsi Chigogo | Chair | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazviteedzwe Chimbetete | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
nyaradzai Eunice Chiwaye | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cleophus Chinonje Chiwaya | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Kamhara | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £2.59k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | £2.44k | £2.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ORPHANS LIVING IN ZIMBABWE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TOWARDS EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, ACTIVITIES, CLOTHES (INCLUDING SCHOOL UNIFORMS AND SHOES) AND EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 CAMLET GROVE
STANTONBURY FIELDS
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 6TD
- Phone:
- 07429543134
- Email:
- tsitsichigogo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
emilianitrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window