Accounts and annual returns THE CROFT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 517113
Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days