HEYWOOD RELIEF IN NEED TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieve persons resident in the area of the former Municipal Borough of Heywood who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by: 1. Making grants of money 2. Providing / paying for items, services or facilities calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress 3. Donations / subscriptions to institutions or organisations which provide services or facilities for such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Rochdale
Governance
- 28 January 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN JOHN DAVIES JP | Chair |
|
||||||
STUART WHITTAKER | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|||||
MARY HUCK RSA | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|||||
PHILIP STEVEN TEMPERLEY | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN HOUSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £3.48k | £3.75k | £5.10k | £5.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.56k | £2.93k | £1.21k | £3.73k | £3.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 31 JULY 1996 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 (2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER MUNICIPAL BOROUGH OF HEYWOOD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITEIS CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
FORMER MUNICIPAL BOROUGH OF HEYWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEYWOOD RELIEF IN NEED
c/o 4 Chaffinch Close
Thornton-Cleveleys
FY5 2UR
- Phone:
- 07833249318
- Email:
- phoenixtrust@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window