CHABAD OF GREENWICH & DOCKLANDS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chabad of Greenwich and the Docklands is here to serve every person in the area with love, care and dedication. We run a large variety of services for Jewish people in the area, regardless of affiliation and background, in addition to services and activities for the general public in Greenwich and the Docklands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Newham
- Southwark
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 23 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Duboy | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Joseph | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Alexander Gilmour | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Yaron Daniel Jacobs | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.74k | £126.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.09k | £147.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH IN GREENWICH AND THE DOCKLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND TEACHINGS OF CHABAD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. II. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GREENWICH AND THE DOCKLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. III. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN GREENWICH AND THE DOCKLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, FOR EXAMPLE BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND/OR SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
GREENWICH AND THE DOCKLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
275-277 Greenwich High road
Greenwich
London
SE10 8NB
- Phone:
- 07472255283
- Email:
- sara@jewishdocklands.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window