Financial history THE HEREFORDSHIRE CHEST FUND

Charity number: 517117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.12k £642 £27.49k £10.69k £3.45k
Total expenditure £2.93k £1.88k £6.26k £6.47k £9.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A