WESTBURY URBAN GARDENERS CIO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to improve and conserve biodiversity in Barking and Dagenham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 06 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy James Hunt | Chair | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Billy Robertson | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Lowndes | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £700 | £126 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS IN URBAN GARDENING AND THE AND THE HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENTAL BENEFITS FROM THAT AND MORE GENERALLY TO EDUCATE ABOUT THE ENVIRONMENT AND IMPROVING AND CONSERVING LOCAL BIODIVERSITY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 St. Awdrys Road
BARKING
Essex
IG11 7QD
- Phone:
- 07971688096
- Email:
- timinbarking@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window