Trustees LEEDS FESTIVAL CHORUS
Charity number: 517127

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Huw Coltman | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kenneth Charles Smith | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Stanyard | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Alexandra Palmer | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Foren | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James William David Moxon | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Frances Elgie | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA KIRKBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.