BEAM MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of members of the public in the subject of music, without distinction of sex sexual orientation age disability nationality race or political religious or other opinions, and to provide facilities for such advancement to individuals who will benefit from the same by reason of their youth age infirmity or disablement financial hardship or social.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shan Elaine Jones | Chair | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANICE WATSON | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Paul Wardale Jones | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £759 | £1.86k | £2.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96 | £677 | £1.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION AGE DISABILITY NATIONALITY RACE OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SUCH ADVANCEMENT TO INDIVIDUALS WHO WILL BENEFIT FROM THE SAME BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND/OR TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
APRIL COTTAGE
LANGOT LANE
FAIR OAK
ECCLESHALL
STAFFORD
ST21 6PP
- Phone:
- 01630620220
- Email:
- beammusicinfo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window