SEAFUL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seaful is the charity helping more people connect to our ocean and waterways. People protect what they love, but they can only love what they know, so our aim is to help more people be mindful of the sea. We want more people to be able to tap into these benefits, to form a personal connection with our blue spaces, and to feel empowered to join the conversation about protecting them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Lousie Sanger | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Emma Musgrove Bsc | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Marie Satsias | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.44k | £25.10k | £45.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.35k | £25.94k | £35.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OCEANS, WATERWAYS AND COASTAL ENVIRONMENTS), AND IN THE MENTAL HEALTH BENEFITS OF CONNECTING WITH THESE ENVIRONMENTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thomas Westcott Chartered Accountants
47 Boutport Street
BARNSTAPLE
Devon
EX31 1SQ
- Phone:
- 01271 374138
- Email:
- hello@seaful.org.uk
- Website:
-
seaful.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window