CHILDREN AND WAR (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to reduce the psychological consequences of war and disaster on children by training responsible adults to implement the evidence-based group interventions that we have developed. We regularly train people from many different countries. We promote research into the effects of traumatic events in order to improve the help provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- South Africa
- Syria
- Ukraine
Governance
- 17 May 2021: CIO registration
- CAW (UK) (Working name)
- CAW (UK) (Working name)
- CHILDREN AND WAR-UK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARIA METAXIA CALLIAS | Chair | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Louise Copping | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hon. Professor Stephen Regel OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Sarah Lehmann | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Roe | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
John Anthony Smith | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Trevathan | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Rosemary Hannaby | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorie Ann Halliday | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Elizabeth Grace Likierman BA, PhD | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Anthony Stuart Hale | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.95k | £49.15k | £35.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.23k | £14.91k | £26.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: 3.1. ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AMELIORATING THE ADVERSE PSYCHOLOGICAL EFFECTS IN CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS WHO HAVE BEEN EXPOSED TO TRAUMATIC EVENTS SUCH AS WARS AND DISASTERS INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF EVIDENCE-BASED INTERVENTIONS THAT MAY HELP SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; AND 3.2. PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT CONCERNING THE SHORT AND LONG TERM EFFECTS AND CONSEQUENCES OF WAR, WARLIKE SITUATIONS AND DISASTERS ON CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO PUBLICLY DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY WORKING WITH AND SUPPORTING SUCH OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CHILDREN AND WAR FOUNDATION (STIFTELSEN BARN OG KRIG INCORPORATED IN NORWAY WITH COMPANYÆS REGISTER NUMBER 882 577 252) AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 KATHERINE COURT
70 HONOR OAK ROAD
LONDON
SE23 3RS
- Phone:
- 07903735025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window