SWELL REVOLUTION

Charity Number: 1193986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE & PROMOTE CHRISTIAN FAITH & VALUES THROUGH; - PRODUCTION & DISTRIBUTION OF MUSIC, MEDIA AND OTHER ART FORMS - PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL ENABLING THE PUBLIC TO ENGAGE IN AND DEVELOP THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND VALUES THROUGH MUSIC, MEDIA AND OTHER ART FORMS - TRAINING AND EQUIPPING OF INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS TO CREATE ARTISTIC CONTENT

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £137,925
Total expenditure: £145,705

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Leonard Lovell Chair 31 August 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Cutting Trustee 05 June 2024
None on record
Joshua Hugh Cutting Trustee 05 June 2024
None on record
Pete James Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Nicola Jane James Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £294.07k £197.84k £137.93k
Total expenditure £174.10k £294.01k £145.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Upperton Gardens
EASTBOURNE
BN21 2AH
Phone:
07876713012