Vache Baroque

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of Vache Baroque are the advancement of the arts and the education of the public for the public benefit, by promoting and advancing the appreciation and enjoyment of music of the baroque era, including by means of (but not limited to) the running of an annual festival of baroque music and/or related art forms, and the establishment of associated educational programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
Governance
- 18 February 2021: CIO registration
- THE VACHE BAROQUE FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Vache Baroque (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Rodney Pines Lewison | Chair | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Longdon | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Estelle Flicker | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maria-del-Carmen Bouverat de Young | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Neal Baker | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James McGoldrick | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JANE WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louis Balogun | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.07k | £156.11k | £157.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.70k | £159.32k | £141.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Feb 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2023 as amended on 22 Oct 2023 as amended on 02 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROMOTING THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND OTHER ART FORMS OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE BAROQUE ERA, INCLUDING BY MEANS OF RUNNING OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND/OR OTHER ART FORMS OF (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE BAROQUE ERA, AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ASSOCIATED EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VACHE
VACHE LANE
CHALFONT ST. GILES
HP8 4SD
- Phone:
- +447870171587
- Email:
- info@vachebaroque.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window