MEDINA MOSQUE STOKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Muslim ritual prayers Construction of the mosque building to enable the charity to provide extended and safer prayer facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 20 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR LATIF HUSSAIN | Chair | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nasar Hussain | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MAZHAR | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.14k | £14.02k | £20.68k | £13.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.30k | £5.48k | £31.84k | £9.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN STOKE ON TRENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
267
WATERLOO ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 3HP
- Phone:
- 07883339956
- Email:
- medinamosquestoke@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window