IVYBRIDGE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ivybridge Methodist Church exists to fulfil the Great Commission of Jesus Christ by making more disciples. We seek to show His great love for us through our words and actions. For more information see www.ivybridgemethodistchurch.co.uk All welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £319 from 1 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 02 December 2020: Standard registration
- IMC (Working name)
- IVYBRIDGE METHODIST CHURCH TRUSTEES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Amanda Suzanne Roper | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Thomas Cole | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Martin | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Chalk | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Allen | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Reid | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Scoble | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN EDMUND GILL | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Robin Richard Erimar DUCKERING | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judy Stean Jago | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Marion Gentle | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jane Hladkij | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Theresa Allen | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Gordon MARRIOTT | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Christopher George Phillips | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Phillips | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dave Rowe | Trustee | 01 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY CAROLE MITCHELL | Trustee | 01 January 1996 |
|
|||||
VALERIE MARRIOTT | Trustee | 01 June 1979 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.05k | £110.62k | £100.68k | £120.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.70k | £94.31k | £84.08k | £97.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.84k | £1.23k | £2.45k | £319 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IVYBRIDGE METHODIST CHURCH
FORE STREET
IVYBRIDGE
DEVON
PL21 9AB
- Phone:
- 01752651910
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window