Trustees MANDALA YOGA ASHRAM

Charity number: 1195209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandra O'Shea Trustee 03 March 2024
None on record
Nicholas David Edge Trustee 07 November 2021
None on record
Lisa Daymond-King Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Russell Smithers Trustee 08 April 2017
None on record
ABHAYA RUPA Trustee 13 April 2009
None on record