STARLIGHT OASIS OF HOPE HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOHH provides awareness raising about palliative care though meetings and media. We train front-line health professionals in Lesotho about palliative care. We support individuals with life limiting illness to improve their wellbeing and alleviation of symptoms where possible. We will be building a hospice in Lesotho
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lesotho
Governance
- 18 August 2021: CIO registration
- SOHH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Miles Paul Myres | Chair | 06 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Pamhidzai Harriet Vera | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Kathleen German | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Donald Wardrop | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tebello Anastacia Malichaba Lepheane | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.24k | £26.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.85k | £26.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN THE KINGDOM OF LESOTHO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1 ADVANCING THE UNDERSTANDING IN THE GENERAL POPULATION OF THE NEED FOR AND BENEFITS PROVIDED BY PALLIATIVE CARE 2 ADVANCING THE TRAINING OF THOSE PROVIDING CARE FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS 3 RELIEVING THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL DISTRESS OF THOSE WITH LIFE LIMITING ILLNESS AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 ASH MEWS
BIRMINGHAM
B27 6TB
- Phone:
- 07385870793
- Email:
- info@sohhospice.org.ls
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window