SAVING DREAMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO which are for the public benefit, are specifically restricted to the following for the benefit of the United Kingdom and overseas: the relief of those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, or other disadvantage by making grants of money for providing or paying for services, items or facilities and advancing in life and helping young people develop skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 19 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Grenville Alexander | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA MALAM | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharm Malam | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Vince Irudayaraj | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.77k | £9.71k | £9.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.27k | £11.11k | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK, INDIA AND KENYA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OF RELIEVE POVERTY. B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK, INDIA AND KENYA BY THE PROVISION OF GOODS, ITEMS AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Hampden Way
LONDON
N14 5DX
- Phone:
- 07946519336
- Email:
- andreamalam@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
Savingdreams.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window