THE CORPORATION OF WINCHELSEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Winchelsea Corporation oversees the preservation and maintenance of Winchelsea Court Hall and Medieval Town Gates, maintains and manages Winchelsea Museum, and fulfils the ceremonial functions associated with its role as an Ancient Town of the Cinque Ports Confederation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 24 November 2020: Standard registration
- WINCHELSEA CORPORATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Cosstick | Chair | 13 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Chappell | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Clare Casey | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Albert Murphy | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Kingham | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John McNeil Clarke | Trustee | 18 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rosemarie Roberts | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John King | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Berenice Scott | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Merrifield | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev David Page | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RODLEY | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Melvin | Trustee | 12 April 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.51k | £21.11k | £24.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.21k | £17.93k | £23.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.67k | £600 | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE THE HISTORIC TRADITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH THE ROLE OF WINCHELSEA AS AN ANCIENT TOWN OF THE CINQUE PORTS CONFEDERATION. 2. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HISTORIC COURT HALL AND TOWN GATES OF WINCHELSEA AND ANY OTHER LAND AND PROPERTIES THEREON IN ITS CHARGE. 3. TO HOLD THE COURT HALL AND THE THREE TOWN GATES (NEW, FERRY AND STRAND) AS DESIGNATED LAND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY. 4. TO OVERSEE THE STATE OF THE COURT HALL, THREE TOWN GATES ENSURING THEY ARE PRESERVED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WORKING WITH OTHER AGENCIES TO MAINTAIN THEIR APPEARANCE. 5. TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A MUSEUM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PROVIDING A RECORD OF THE TOWN OF WINCHELSEA AND ITS PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Court Hall
High Street
Winchelsea
TN36 4EA
- Phone:
- 01797224762
- Email:
- winchelsea.tc@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
www,winchelsea.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window