HAVEN COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of our Centre in Bristol is to provide creative and stimulating activities, care and support to adults (Members) with various additional needs including physical, sensory or learning disability. We offer opportunities to learn new skills to gain greater knowledge and independence. Some seek to learn more about the Christian faith. Our hope is that all have more fulfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Matthew Bullock | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bullock | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Simon Reeves | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALICE LAWRENCE | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Stephen Wright | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
CUTHBERT NEIL MOBBS | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.01k | £185.61k | £18.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.51k | £255.08k | £81.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £166.13k | £153.19k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, REGARDLESS OF RACE OR RELIGION, BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT; AND B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS OF THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE,PARTICULARLY AMONGST PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haven Community
Ruthven Road
Filwood Park
Bristol
BS4 1ST
- Phone:
- 01179851188
- Email:
- admin@havencommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window