Trustees MAKE SPACE FOR GIRLS
Charity number: 1193772

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oluwatayo Isa-Daniel | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Romy Karen Rawlings | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Catherine Todd Smith | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Manning Wood | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Louise Howden | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Koudelkova | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Small | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Grant-Peters | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Louise Kilkenny Siddiqi | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Honor Marina Rhodes O.B.E. | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rohais Millar | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.