SHRI RAM SEVA SAMITI, TEMPLE & COMMUNITY TRUST (DONCASTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Hindu Faith, its doctrines and its scriptures and practice Hindu beliefs through assembly, worship and discourse amongst the members of the Hindu community and other interested parties in Doncaster and neighbouring towns and villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Doncaster
Governance
- 27 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajesh Mittal | Chair | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chhitij Mohan | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chaman Lal Gupta | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Subhash Chander | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shivdeep Sharma | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Madhu Bala Gug | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anita Sethi | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.68k | £3 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £88 | £81 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE HINDU FAITH, ITS DOCTRINES AND ITS SCRIPTURES AND PRACTICE HINDU BELIEFS THROUGH ASSEMBLY, WORSHIP AND DISCOURSE AMONGST THE MEMBERS OF THE HINDU COMMUNITY AND OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES IN DONCASTER AND NEIGHBOURING TOWNS AND VILLAGES BY: 1. ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING THE MANDIR (TEMPLE) AS A HOLY PLACE OF WORSHIP AND ENRICH THE DEVOTEES BY CONDUCTING REGULAR CUSTOMARY HINDU PRAYERS AND DEVOTIONAL ACTIVITIES. 2. PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PERFORMING HINDU RITES ASSOCIATED WITH BIRTHS, DEATHS AND MARRIAGES. 3. ADVANCING TRADITIONAL HINDU CULTURAL ACTIVITIES, RELIGIOUS STUDIES AND PERFORMING ARTS. 4. PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES, SOCIAL INTERACTION AMONG ALL THE PEOPLE IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY INCLUDING SPREADING AWARENESS ABOUT HEALTH & WELL-BEING, YOGA, MEDITATION AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT. 5. ORGANISING AND PERFORMING PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF ALL HINDU RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 STURTON CLOSE
DONCASTER
DN4 7JG
- Phone:
- 07967566859
- Email:
- rajeshmittal@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window