Trustees ENGLEFIELD VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity number: 1194350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN DENNISON Chair 06 May 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Wirth Trustee 04 April 2024
None on record
Olivia Macey Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Duncan Rands Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Edward Crookes Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
HILARY LATIMER Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record