Accounts and annual returns BREACHWOOD GREEN

Charity Number: 1193397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 26 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 March 2023 13 May 2024 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2023 05 July 2024 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window