HEREFORDSHIRE GROWING POINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose is the provision of gardening sessions ( led by tutors) as a form of therapy for all age groups in all circumstances. Our beneficiaries enjoy being part of social groups and the opportunity to get involved in growing plants, harvesting produce and exhibiting at our Autumn Show. There are also social events including a BBQ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 13 January 2022: CIO registration
- 24 October 2022: Funds received from 1006625 HEREFORDSHIRE GROWING POINT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Hone | Chair | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Candida Hopkinson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Lechmere Lady | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Huntley | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanie Falconer | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Julie Cohn | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Knight | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Parry | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.25k | £84.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.18k | £77.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY HORTICULTURAL THERAPY FOR THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE VULNERABLE OR SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, THROUGH OLD AGE, ILLNESS OR DISABILITY, EITHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY (WHETHER PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY) IN HEREFORDSHIRE AND THE AREAS ADJOINING HEREFORDSHIRE, BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF ORGANISED HORTICULTURAL THERAPY SESSIONS TO ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND MENTAL WELLBEING FOR THIS GROUP OF PEOPLE, IN GARDEN SETTINGS OR APPROPRIATE ENVIRONMENTS SUCH AS RESIDENTIAL CARE, SUITED TO INDIVIDUAL NEED. 2. PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION. BEING PART OF A GARDENING GROUP IS A BENEFIT FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE LIMITED OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL ENGAGEMENT. 3. PROMOTION OF HEALTHY LIVING, BY GROWING,HARVESTING AND COOKING FRUIT AND VEGETABLES. 4. PROMOTION OF PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFITS OF SOCAIL AND HORTICULTURAL THERAPY BY MEANS OF SOCIAL MEDIA, WEBSITE AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Headway House
Trenchard Avenue
Credenhill
Hereford
HR4 7DX
- Phone:
- 01432805705
- Email:
- info@growingpoint.org.uk
- Website:
-
growingpoint.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window