FRIENDS OF DALMAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Dalmain is a parent-teacher association for Dalmain Primary School in London. Its purpose is to advance the education of its pupils, by developing relationships between members of the school community and engaging in activities or providing equipment to support the school and pupils. It does this by putting on events to raise funds and engage with the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lewisham
Governance
- 09 December 2020: Standard registration
- FOD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Woodall | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Stern | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hester Martha Fox | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Walden | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Whitney | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £19.06k | £26.75k | £29.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.61k | £11.95k | £27.83k | £27.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DALMAIN PRIMARY SCHOOL
GROVE CLOSE
LONDON
SE23 1AS
- Phone:
- 02086992675
- Email:
- friendsofdalmain@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window