A CHILD'S WISH

Charity Number: 1192870
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,224
Total expenditure: £6,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary oliver Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
RYAN ALEXANDER BELL Trustee 18 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.87k £8.94k £6.22k
Total expenditure £4.01k £11.06k £6.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 April 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 April 2024 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 St Christophers Way
Pride Park
Derby
DE24 8JY
Phone:
08000614083