NORLAND CREW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norland Crew provide advice and support services regarding issues of loneliness, trauma and a signposting service to access other services if required. In addition the organisation organises trips to events and places with particular relevance to the service users, i.e. remembrance parades and war graves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £5,250 from 2 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 February 2021: CIO registration
- NORLAND CREW CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Thompson | Chair | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Metcalfe | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Degg | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.45k | £12.78k | £6.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.38k | £6.99k | £5.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £5.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.78k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 09 FEB 2021 AMENDED ON 09 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF VETERANS OF ALL BRANCHES OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO SERVED AS PART OF THE CREW OF THE NORLAND DURING THE FALKLANDS CONFLICT BY: 1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG VETERANS TO PREVENT THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THEM AND TO HELP THEM INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIETY “SOCIALLY EXCLUDED” MEAN EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, DUE TO MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES OR AS A RESULT OF BEING UNABLE TO ADJUST TO A CIVILIAN ENVIRONMENT. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND ITEMS TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 MILLERS WALK
HULL
HU5 4BP
- Phone:
- 01482445138
- Email:
- keiththompson26@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window