THYMICUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a support network for patients with thymic cancers. We also advocate on their behalf.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Ruddock | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marrika Colvin | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heidrun Bien | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | £13.32k | £16.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £755 | £758 | £751 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT PEOPLE AFFECTED BY THYMIC CANCERS, AND TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND ACCESS TO AVAILABLE TREATMENTS FOR PATIENTS WITH THYMIC CANCERS IN THE UK. WE WILL ENDEAVOUR TO DO THIS BY: A. IDENTIFYING PATIENTS WITH THYMIC CANCERS AND OFFERING SUPPORT THROUGHOUT THEIR JOURNEY. B. PROVIDING INFORMATION RESOURCES FOR PATIENTS, CARERS AND MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS SUCH AS LISTING AVAILABLE TREATMENTS, CLINICAL TRIALS AND THE LOCATION OF THYMIC CANCER SPECIALISTS IN THE UK. C. RAISING AWARENESS OF THYMIC CANCERS AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS. D. PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DETECTION, DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF THYMIC CANCERS. E. LIAISING WITH RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS SUCH AS THE BRITISH THORACIC ONCOLOGY GROUP (BTOG), INTERNATIONAL THYMIC MALIGNANCY INTEREST GROUP (ITMIG) AND THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND TREATMENT OF THYMIC CANCERS. F. LIAISING WITH AND INFLUENCING KEY HEALTH DECISION MAKERS SUCH AS NICE AND THE NHS IN THE UK. G. FACILITATING FUNDRAISING TO PROMOTE THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 WORCESTER ROAD
LONDON
E17 5QR
- Phone:
- 02085233468
- Email:
- hello@thymicuk.org
- Website:
-
thymicuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window