AMPUTEE AND TRAUMA SUPPORT GROUP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides mentoring and emotional support to people who have suffered amputations or traumatic injuries and sign posting services to improve their quality of life and well being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 January 2021: CIO registration
- ATSGUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Jabir Jiva | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Riddington | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Joanne Riddington | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Hasan Qamruddin | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.28k | £53.80k | £824 | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.22k | £18.68k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AMPUTEES OR PEOPLE WITH LIMB IMPAIRMENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES/CARERS (“THE BENEFICIARIES”) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: · AN HOLISTIC PEER TO PEER SUPPORT SERVICE DESIGNED TO MEET THE SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL NEEDS OF BENEFICIARIES OFFERING ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON MATTERS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, COMING TO TERMS WITH LIMB LOSS OR IMPAIRMENT, STUMP HEALTH, PAIN MANAGEMENT, HEALTHY AND ACTIVE LIFESTYLES AND HOME ADAPTATIONS; · A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE DIRECTING BENEFICIARIES TO APPROPRIATE SOURCES OF SPECIALIST ADVICE AND INFORMATION RELATING TO, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, LEGAL MATTERS, ACCESSING WELFARE BENEFITS, PHYSICAL THERAPY AND EDUCATION/RETRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CROSS ROAD
HAWLEY
DARTFORD
DA2 7RR
- Phone:
- 07788620820
- Email:
- info@atsguk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window