Financial history HOME FROM HOSPITAL CARE AFTER TREATMENT

Charity number: 517190
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £373.74k £625.08k £406.49k £370.23k £282.08k
Total expenditure £363.42k £314.33k £411.25k £443.87k £289.15k
Income from government contracts £300.00k £398.74k £294.58k £286.56k £190.43k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.52k £5.20k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £78.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £544.92k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £314.33k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A