GLOBAL TREEHOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Global Treehouse Foundation exists to foster a global community of new innovative children's palliative care providers, to support existing providers to innovate and share excellence, and to advocate children's palliative care as a dynamic and central aspect of universal healthcare coverage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Peter Roland | Chair | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maurizio Petta | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gianluca Fontana | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Eastmond | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £25.66k | £290.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £25.66k | £132.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO IMPROVE THE LIVES AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LIFE-LIMITING AND LIFE-THREATENING CONDITIONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS GLOBALLY. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY IMPROVING THE LIVES AND TREATMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LIFE-LIMITING AND LIFE THREATENING CONDITIONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS GLOBALLY, IN PARTICULAR BY WORKING WITH HOSPITALS, HOSPICES AND OTHER STAKEHOLDERS TO BRING BEST PRACTICES TO BEAR AND IMPROVE ACCESS TO AND QUALITY OF CHILDREN'S PALLIATIVE CARE GLOBALLY. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST THOSE WORKING IN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE) IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PALLIATIVE CARE AND/OR PAIN RELIEF FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BY CREATING AND SUPPORTING INNOVATION-ORIENTED NETWORKS, AND PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF BEST QUALITY CHILDREN’S PALLIATIVE CARE GLOBALLY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Wing
Somerset House
Strand
London
WC2R 1LA
- Phone:
- 07970224473
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window